Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0110Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - ExtensionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0176 / CH0710
    (SB0299)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 710Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0205Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0244
    (SB1163)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberyDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0330Vehicle Laws - Young Drivers - Hour RestrictionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0343Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration PlateDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0406 / CH0362
    (SB0315)
Clean Cars Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0492 / CH0684Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary DesignationDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0563Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - IssuanceDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0756 / CH0747Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle ShowsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 747Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0844
    (SB0799 / CH0488)
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of PointsDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1017 / CH0717Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1120 / CH0560
    (SB1004)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance StandardsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1150 / CH0757Vehicle Laws - Off-Highway Recreational VehiclesDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1296Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1401Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1447 / CH0758Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - ReturnDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 758Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1645Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing IndividualsDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0020Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer ShowsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0034 / CH0344Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise TaxChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0045 / CH0195Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records ChecksChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0089Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Mailing AddressSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0299
    (HB0176 / CH0710)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0315
    (HB0406 / CH0362)
Clean Cars Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0342Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - RequirementsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0393 / CH0363Clean Cars Act of 2017Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0566Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0799 / CH0488
    (HB0844)
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of PointsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0979 / CH0694Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and SnowmobilesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 694Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1004
    (HB1120 / CH0560)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance StandardsSenator HoughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1097Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of SykesvilleSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB1163
    (HB0244)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberySenator PetersIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.