Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 42

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0158
    (SB0192)
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - PenaltyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0160Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Riding on SidewalksDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0166Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video RecordingsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0173Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart ZonesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0223Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0251
    (SB0785)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0339Vehicle Laws - Bicycles - Required Use of Protective HeadgearDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0421Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0435Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0445Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Overtaking Another VehicleDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0467 / CH0118Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit DurationAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0593
    (SB0298)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Allegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0619
    (SB0206)
Vehicle Laws - Intercounty Connector - Maximum Speed LimitDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0693Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsDelegate ConwayIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0732
    (SB0205)
Vehicle Laws - Fleeing or Eluding PoliceDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0753 / CH0637
    (SB0339 / CH0638)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and PenaltiesDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0759Vehicle Laws - Distracted Driving - ProhibitionDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0889
    (SB0621 / CH0066)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0929Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1094Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1149Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In VehiclesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1184
    (SB0847)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1346Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1442Vehicular Accidents - Disclosure of Driver's Home Telephone Number Without Approval - ProhibitionDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1465Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0087 / CH0179Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0192
    (HB0158)
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - PenaltySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0193Vehicle Laws - Prohibition on Handheld Telephone Use - Primary Offense if Child Is PassengerSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0205
    (HB0732)
Vehicle Laws - Fleeing or Eluding PoliceSenator ShankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0206
    (HB0619)
Vehicle Laws - Intercounty Connector - Maximum Speed LimitSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0207Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0246Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0298
    (HB0593)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Senator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0339 / CH0638
    (HB0753 / CH0637)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and PenaltiesSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow TruckSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0389Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0499Vehicle Laws - Obstruction of Driver's ViewSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0621 / CH0066
    (HB0889)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0785
    (HB0251)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0847
    (HB1184)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1048Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil PenaltiesSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:42 A.M.