Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 40

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0088Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the RoadDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0212Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - PenaltiesDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0213Motor Vehicles - Aggressive DrivingDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0214
    (SB1123)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0253 / CH0257
    (SB0309)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0322
    (SB0885)
Frederick County - Failure to Obey Traffic Control Device on Maryland Route 75 - PenaltyDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0426Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike LanesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0436
    (SB0468)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0523 / CH0107E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized ChargesDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0559Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0562Speed Monitoring Systems - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - RepealDelegate CarrIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0563
    (SB0053)
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0611Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - LimitationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0662Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0809Marijuana - Smoking or Consuming in a Vehicle or Vessel - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0839Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0863Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Calibration ChecksDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1035Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Days and Times of Operation, Minimum Excess Speed, and PenaltiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane ChangesDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1052
    (SB0961)
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Automated AuditsDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1179 / CH0734Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid VehiclesDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1284
    (SB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle SurfacesDelegate PattersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1414Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)Delegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1431Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1598
    (SB1120)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueDelegate ParrottIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0053
    (HB0563)
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementSenator RamirezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0164Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Restrictions on Child PassengersSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0213State Police - Speed Camera Revenue - Enforcement ActivitiesSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0309
    (HB0253 / CH0257)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0468
    (HB0436)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0475Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct TrafficSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0627
    (HB1284)
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle SurfacesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0769Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems - Continuous AuditsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0885
    (HB0322)
Frederick County - Failure to Obey Traffic Control Device on Maryland Route 75 - PenaltySenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0891Criminal Law - Use and Possession of MarijuanaSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0961
    (HB1052)
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Automated AuditsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0992Vehicle Laws - Giving Way to Overtaking Vehicles in the Left LaneSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1073Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - PenaltiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1120
    (HB1598)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueSenator ReillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1123
    (HB0214)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.