Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0046Motor Vehicles - Farm Equipment - Wide- or Oversize-Load SignalsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0106 / CH0186
    (SB0475 / CH0187)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesDelegate BuschApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0123Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery VehiclesDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0253 / CH0543Motor Vehicles - Automobile TransportersChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 543Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0316Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual MileageDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0646 / CH0494
    (SB1069 / CH0495)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1164Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - RequirementDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1384Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory SignsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1403Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – PenaltiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1543Tow Trucks – Driver Safety ActDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1605Task Force on Maryland Student Transportation SafetyDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1714Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker LightsDelegate MosbyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0044Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance RequirementsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0363Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0475 / CH0187
    (HB0106 / CH0186)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB1069 / CH0495
    (HB0646 / CH0494)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.