Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0031
    (SB0272 / CH0151)
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0133
    (SB0159)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0243 / CH0591Vehicle Laws - Unauthorized Use of Rented Motor Vehicle - RepealDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0250 / CH0392Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - MopedsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0376Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Unlawful VehiclesDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0440 / CH0268
    (SB0058 / CH0267)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0538Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0682
    (SB0545)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB0730
    (SB0662)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of SubrogationDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0882 / CH0241Motor Vehicles - Low Speed Vehicles - Power SourceDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1227Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety CheckpointsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1354Motor Vehicle Administration - Multiple Copies of Driving Records - FeesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1397Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Notice Regarding Authorized DriversDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1467Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of PaymentDelegate MinnickIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0058 / CH0267
    (HB0440 / CH0268)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0088 / CH0274Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed BondsChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0159
    (HB0133)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0272 / CH0151
    (HB0031)
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Senator JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0545
    (HB0682)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0662
    (HB0730)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of SubrogationSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.