Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0008
    (SB0126)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0347Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - PenaltiesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0348
    (SB0041)
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence RepealDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0679Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized RemovalDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0681Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0688Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0817Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Repeal of Administrative PenaltiesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0912 / CH0447
    (SB0888 / CH0446)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be InsuredDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0922 / CH0408
    (SB0579 / CH0407)
Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1172
    (SB0751)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1473Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat BeltsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1518
    (SB1122)
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - PenaltyDelegate BeidleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1588Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response TripsDelegate Howard, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1641Vehicle Laws - Proof of Insurance for Motor Vehicles Registered in Another StateDelegate ParrottIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0036Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized RemovalSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0041
    (HB0348)
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0126
    (HB0008)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0152Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for IntoxicationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0183School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0579 / CH0407
    (HB0922 / CH0408)
Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - DefinitionSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0751
    (HB1172)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of SubrogationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0888 / CH0446
    (HB0912 / CH0447)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be InsuredSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1122
    (HB1518)
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - PenaltySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.