Abandoned Property

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0372Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential PropertyDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0511 / CH0428Real Property - Residential Property - Ground LeasesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0607Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0935 / CH0289Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1177Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0197Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted BuildingsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsMunicipal Corporations (L3)
SB0613
    (HB0786 / CH0103)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.