Abuse

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0020
    (SB0411)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased PenaltiesDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0023Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0031
    (SB0412)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0153Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme WeatherDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0225
    (SB0269 / CH0335)
Domestic Violence - Additional ReliefDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0255Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable AdultsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0263 / CH0233Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit MurderDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0301
    (SB0414)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0337
    (SB0366)
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as AdultsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0362
    (SB0393)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of CostsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0581Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - StandingDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0956Criminal Law - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended - ProhibitionDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1198
    (SB0882 / CH0130)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0018State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for DisciplineSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0026Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme TemperaturesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0269 / CH0335
    (HB0225)
Domestic Violence - Additional ReliefSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0366
    (HB0337)
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0393
    (HB0362)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of CostsSenator RaskinIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0411
    (HB0020)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased PenaltiesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0412
    (HB0031)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0414
    (HB0301)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0882 / CH0130
    (HB1198)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.