Abuse

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0040Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse RegistryDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0211Prince George's County Board of Education - Teachers and Administrators - Child Protective Services Investigation Findings PG 510-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0212
    (SB1038 / CH0238)
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing ConditionsDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0565Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and RemovalDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0599Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive ControlDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0618Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1134
    (SB0800)
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an AnimalDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1238
    (SB1203)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant ProgramDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1303 / CH0425
    (SB0491 / CH0426)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective OrdersDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1629Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse RegistryDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1822Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police DepartmentDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1824Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0214Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0386 / CH0454Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018Senator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Finance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0491 / CH0426
    (HB1303 / CH0425)
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective OrdersSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0800
    (HB1134)
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and SodomySenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1038 / CH0238
    (HB0212)
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing ConditionsSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1203
    (HB1238)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.