Administrative Procedure Act

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016
    (SB0261)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0241Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulations - Public Hearings and VotingSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0261
    (HB0016)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1008Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial ReviewSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.