Advance Medical Directives

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0091 / CH0389
    (SB0442 / CH0388)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions DayDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Health and Government Operations
2/3/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0441Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis TeamsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1385 / CH0510Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance DirectivesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0442 / CH0388
    (HB0091 / CH0389)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions DaySenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.