Advertising

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0120 / CH0101Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product MarketingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0136 / CH0106Insurance - Public AdjustersChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0309 / CH0305Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0398
    (SB0404)
Labor and Employment - Salary History Information DisclosuresDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing canceledEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0703
    (SB0113)
Public Health - Tobacco Control FundingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0762Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot ProgramDelegate PlattIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0898 / CH0852Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0990Harford County - BingoHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1022Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist OrdersDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1239
    (SB0280)
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and LabelingDelegate FrushIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1489Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0113
    (HB0703)
Public Health - Tobacco Control FundingSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0118Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0280
    (HB1239)
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and LabelingSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEnvironment (M3)
SB0311 / CH0588
    (HB0426 / CH0589)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0325Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's LicensesSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0404
    (HB0398)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay - Job Announcement and Salary History Information DisclosuresSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0847Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required SignageSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1194Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership FundSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1200Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the House - Referred Economic MattersFinance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.