Agriculture, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0400
    (SB0364)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0433
    (SB0412)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0775 / CH0524
    (SB0675 / CH0523)
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information WorkgroupDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1017 / CH0659Income Tax Credit - Wineries and VineyardsDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 659Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1327 / CH0151Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - CollectionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0038Income Tax - Tax Credit for Wineries and VineyardsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0053 / CH0171Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested CasesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0180 / CH0027Department of Agriculture - State Chemist FundChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0364
    (HB0400)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0412
    (HB0433)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0675 / CH0523
    (HB0775 / CH0524)
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information WorkgroupSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersAgriculture (M4)
SB0739Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil TestingSenator PinskyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0820 / CH0561
    (HB0767 / CH0562)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0970Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - CompensationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.