Agriculture, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0452 / CH0291
    (SB0389 / CH0292)
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0515 / CH0246Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – StudyDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0698 / CH0475Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - EstablishmentDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 475Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0732
    (SB0675 / CH0236)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0766
    (SB0610)
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic ReviewDelegate HealeyIn the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0866Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic TechnologiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0917 / CH0275
    (SB1032 / CH0274)
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - CompositionFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0972 / CH0542Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery LicensesDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 542Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0980
    (SB0700)
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal RefugeDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1221Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Protection of Personal InformationDelegate GilchristIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1350 / CH0628
    (SB1006 / CH0629)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1532 / CH0404
    (SB0991 / CH0405)
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1597 / CH0796Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – ReportsDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 796Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1662 / CH0237Business Regulation – Retail Pet StoresDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0389 / CH0292
    (HB0452 / CH0291)
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationAgriculture (M4)
SB0675 / CH0236
    (HB0732)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Senator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0700
    (HB0980)
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal RefugeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0991 / CH0405
    (HB1532 / CH0404)
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1006 / CH0629
    (HB1350 / CH0628)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1032 / CH0274
    (HB0917 / CH0275)
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - CompositionSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1201 / CH0476Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - EstablishmentSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 476Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.