AIDS

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0354 / CH0396
    (SB0263)
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0761 / CH0422
    (SB0874)
Health Insurance - Specialty DrugsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0263
    (HB0354 / CH0396)
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramBaltimore City SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0874
    (HB0761 / CH0422)
Health Insurance - Specialty DrugsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.