Aircraft

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0012
    (SB0019 / CH0164)
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at AircraftDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1004
    (SB0774 / CH0546)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolDelegate CardinIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1007
    (SB0744)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf CourseDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1233Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of DronesDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0019 / CH0164
    (HB0012)
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at AircraftSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0774 / CH0546
    (HB1004)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1050Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation MuseumSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.