Alternative Dispute Resolution

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0220
    (SB0273)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0547Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0738 / CH0271Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in ProcurementDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0829
    (SB0570)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB1060Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated MeetingsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1172 / CH0470Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - LicensesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0143Health Care Malpractice Claims - Notice of IntentSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0252Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0273
    (HB0220)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0374 / CH0165
    (HB0405)
Maryland False Claims ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0399Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice GuidelinesSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0570
    (HB0829)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.