Annotated Code of Maryland

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0103 / CH0205Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - RenamingChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0134 / CH0105Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0161Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RestructuringChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0180
    (SB0082 / CH0214)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - RenamingDelegate MorhaimVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0247Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1094 / CH0338
    (SB0587 / CH0337)
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance StructureDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1506 / CH0633
    (SB0700 / CH0634)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1595 / CH0847
    (SB1127 / CH0848)
Baltimore City Community College - RealignmentDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847Appropriations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB0039Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and CorrectionsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0074 / CH0631Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - NonprofitsSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0082 / CH0214
    (HB0180)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - RenamingSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0165 / CH0055Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0493 / CH0061Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0494 / CH0062Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0587 / CH0337
    (HB1094 / CH0338)
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance StructureSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0700 / CH0634
    (HB1506 / CH0633)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0994School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1020Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB1127 / CH0848
    (HB1595 / CH0847)
Baltimore City Community College - RealignmentSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.