Apartments

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0261 / CH0534Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property ManagerDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Economic Matters
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0592 / CH0537
    (SB0915)
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - DwellingsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0600
    (SB0175)
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame RestrictionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0948Senior Apartment Housing Facilities - Baltimore City - Security Guard ServicesDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0175
    (HB0600)
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame RestrictionsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0408Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of ViolenceSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0759Property Tax - Credit for Accessibility Design Features - Newly Constructed Apartment BuildingsSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0915
    (HB0592 / CH0537)
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - DwellingsSenator GuzzoneIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.