Arbitration

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0497
    (SB0760)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0670Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0676
    (SB0670)
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing DocumentsDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0871
    (SB0652)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0225Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0652
    (HB0871)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0670
    (HB0676)
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing DocumentsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0760
    (HB0497)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineSenator GuzzoneIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.