Armed Forces

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0035Criminal Law - Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting a Handgun - Active Assignment ExceptionDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0038Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant QualificationsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0051Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0195Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Health Care Pensions - Health Care Workforce ShortageDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0356 / CH0105Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan ProgramChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0359 / CH0614Militia - Maryland Defense Force - Enlistment PeriodChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0427Election Law - Absentee Ballots - TimelinessDelegate ImpallariaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0439Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate FrankIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0503Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate ProctorIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0558Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0659Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Veteran Status - Acceptable DocumentationDelegate BotelerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0740
    (SB0705)
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed ForcesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0772
    (SB0399)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0812Hunting - Certificate of Competency and Safety - Veterans and Active Duty MilitaryDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0935 / CH0654Public Institutions of Higher Education - In-State Tuition for Military VeteransDelegate StiflerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1005
    (SB1002)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cheverly American Legion Post 108Delegate SummersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1195Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on RentalsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0012 / CH0163Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed ForcesSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0044Occupational and Professional Licensing - Military Training and Military SpousesSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0103Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeSenator PetersIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0153 / CH0024Higher Education - Academic Credit for Military Education, Training, and ExperienceSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 24Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0399
    (HB0772)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0705
    (HB0740)
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed ForcesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB1002
    (HB1005)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cheverly American Legion Post 108Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.