Armed Forces

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088
    (SB0281)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0095Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0122Public Safety - Assault Weapons and Detachable Magazines - Possession or Transport by NonresidentDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0128
    (SB0188)
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionDelegate FrankIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0203
    (SB0036)
State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building GroundsDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0353
    (SB0143)
Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0433 / CH0405
    (SB0619)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Frederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0442Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0479Income Tax - Military Retirement Income - Health Care PractitionersDelegate EckardtIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0770Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate ProctorIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1005Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Retired MilitaryDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1011Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2014Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1039Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals (Maryland Condominium Owners Emergency Relief Act)Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1168Electricity - Certificate - Wind Turbines - LimitationSouthern Maryland DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1178
    (SB0373)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Educare Resource CenterDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1215 / CH0340
    (SB0785 / CH0339)
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer ScholarshipDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Higher Education (F2)
HB1355Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Department of Defense Survivor Benefits ProgramDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1419Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1420Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1422Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1424Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1523Property Tax Exemption - Dwelling House of Disabled Veteran or Surviving Spouse - Repeal of Domicile RequirementsDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1547Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed ForcesDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0009Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans Organizations That Sell Marine Corps UniformsSenator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0018Higher Education - Military Dependents - In-State TuitionSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0024Higher Education - Military Dependents - Nonresident Tuition ExemptionSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0036
    (HB0203)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0143
    (HB0353)
Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0188
    (HB0128)
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0278Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0281
    (HB0088)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0373
    (HB1178)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Educare Resource CenterSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0523Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandSenator FeldmanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Higher Education (F2)
SB0619
    (HB0433 / CH0405)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Senator BrinkleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0651General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans DaySenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0785 / CH0339
    (HB1215 / CH0340)
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer ScholarshipSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.