Armed Forces

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004 / CH0462
    (SB0046 / CH0463)
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, and Disabled VeteransDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 462Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0012 / CH0543Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Eligibility, Award Amounts, and Use of FundsDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0068 / CH0461Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart RecipientsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0238Housing - Workforce Housing Grant Program - Mandatory FundingDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0275 / CH0183Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Recommended Courses in Military CultureDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0368Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law)Delegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0375
    (SB0321)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0388
    (SB0322)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0508Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0544
    (SB0003)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0550Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0636
    (SB0010)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0637
    (SB1117)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Resiliency and Education Center at Kuhn HallDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0664 / CH0033
    (SB0579 / CH0675)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0851 / CH0704Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 704Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0937Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1014Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Family Caregivers of Qualified Armed Services MembersDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1194Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1389
    (SB0295)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years OldDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1401Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1586
    (SB1019)
Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance StudyDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0003
    (HB0544)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0010
    (HB0636)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0013Public Safety - State MilitiaChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0046 / CH0463
    (HB0004 / CH0462)
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled VeteransSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0049 / CH0705Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 705Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0067Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military CompensationSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0295
    (HB1389)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years OldSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0321
    (HB0375)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomePresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0322
    (HB0388)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0368Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0579 / CH0675
    (HB0664 / CH0033)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0598State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - EligibilitySenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1019
    (HB1586)
Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance StudySenator CassillyIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1117
    (HB0637)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Resiliency and Education Center at Kuhn HallSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.