Arrests

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0182Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0254Division of Parole and Probation - Revocation Prohibited - CitationDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0359Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's AttorneyDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0390
    (SB0425 / CH0387)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program - StatewideDelegate ReillyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0414Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept ProgramCharles County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0475Courts - Grand Juries - Prohibited ActionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0482Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Recording EquipmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0487Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Harford County - Warrant Intercept ProgramDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0521
    (SB0589)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and LimitationsDelegate SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0560
    (SB0349)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0565 / CH0514Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code ViolationDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0585Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Policies and Reporting RequirementsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0701Task Force to Study the Warrant Intercept Program for Maryland Income Tax RefundsDelegate WalkerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0785
    (SB0233 / CH0542)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0846Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and AnalysisDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0876Public Safety - District Court Commissioner - Complaints of Police BrutalityDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0956
    (SB0741)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1097
    (SB0729)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramEastern Shore DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1107Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless ArrestsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1364
    (SB1039)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1441Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Protective Headgear While in CustodyDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1452
    (SB0902)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1466Task Force to Study Restorative Justice Discipline Practices in Maryland Public SchoolsDelegate Washington, A.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1525Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept ProgramCarroll County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0044Seat Belts - Operation of Motor Vehicle While Inmate or Person in Custody Unrestrained - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0233 / CH0542
    (HB0785)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 542Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0349
    (HB0560)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany, Carroll, Cecil, Garrett, and Harford Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0425 / CH0387
    (HB0390)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program - StatewideSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0589
    (HB0521)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and LimitationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0729
    (HB1097)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator HersheyIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0741
    (HB0956)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0902
    (HB1452)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1039
    (HB1364)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1059Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions and Grievance ProceduresSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.