Arrests

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0739 / CH0802
    (SB0941 / CH0803)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsDelegate MoonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1343 / CH0309Howard County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Authority Ho. Co. 24-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1362
    (SB0835)
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community TrustDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1435
    (SB0725)
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body AttachmentDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0725
    (HB1435)
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body AttachmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0835
    (HB1362)
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust ActSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0941 / CH0803
    (HB0739 / CH0802)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.