Arson

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0699
    (SB0416)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0416
    (HB0699)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.