Assessments and Taxation, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0235 / CH0361Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - DatabaseDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0702 / CH0068
    (SB0622 / CH0067)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0856Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0881Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0888Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals ProcessDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1158Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax RebateDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1246
    (SB0469)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0251Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed ValueSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0469
    (HB1246)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0622 / CH0067
    (HB0702 / CH0068)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB1022Prince George's County - Green Business ZonesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.