Assessments and Taxation, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0161Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0312
    (SB0077 / CH0008)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0335Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation AreaDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0511 / CH0428Real Property - Residential Property - Ground LeasesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0663
    (SB0179)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0996
    (SB0375)
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - RepealDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0077 / CH0008
    (HB0312)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0179
    (HB0663)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0375
    (HB0996)
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - RepealSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0507Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0590
    (HB0480)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015PresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0670Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0698Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet DatabaseSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0774
    (HB0940 / CH0138)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.