Assessments and Taxation, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0045State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment FinancingDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0123Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation AreaDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0285 / CH0258
    (SB0455)
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment FinancingDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0378 / CH0668
    (SB0322 / CH0667)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness CampaignDelegate TarlauEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0471
    (SB0622)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0531
    (SB0181)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0561Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2016Delegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0572Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0729Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0794Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task ForceDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0812
    (SB0432)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1061Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - RegistrationDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1363 / CH0737Property Tax - Appeals - Provision of Information to TaxpayersDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1409
    (SB0263)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park LandDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1419
    (SB0034)
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1446 / CH0653State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - ProhibitionsDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1529Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required RedemptionDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1544
    (SB1065)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0034
    (HB1419)
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0076 / CH0156Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - ScheduleChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0088 / CH0341Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special FundsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0115Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of PropertySenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0119 / CH0350Business Regulation - Business Discounts and Preferences for Veterans - IdentificationSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Finance
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0181
    (HB0531)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0322 / CH0667
    (HB0378 / CH0668)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness CampaignSenator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0386
    (HB0450)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0432
    (HB0812)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0455
    (HB0285 / CH0258)
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment FinancingSenator McFaddenIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1043Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB1065
    (HB1544)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.