Associations

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0064
    (SB0874)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Mayo Civic Association Community HallDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0274
    (SB0345)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - RegistrationDelegate HubbardIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0404Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0409 / CH0521
    (SB0443)
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0581 / CH0379Hospitals - Establishment of Palliative Care Pilot ProgramsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0702 / CH0068
    (SB0622 / CH0067)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0929Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0960
    (SB0859)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1123Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Girls Lacrosse - Protective Head GearDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1166
    (SB0777 / CH0321)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1193Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and AssociationsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1231State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1272
    (SB0964)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1327 / CH0151Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - CollectionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1342 / CH0678Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data TransfersDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0094Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task ForceSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0230 / CH0209Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0345
    (HB0274)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - LicensureSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0443
    (HB0409 / CH0521)
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CyclesSenator DysonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0622 / CH0067
    (HB0702 / CH0068)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0671 / CH0520Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0777 / CH0321
    (HB1166)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0859
    (HB0960)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0874
    (HB0064)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Mayo Civic Association Community HallSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0945 / CH0679Higher Education - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data TransfersSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 679Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0964
    (HB1272)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHigher Education (F2)
SJ0001International Education - SupportSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.