Associations

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0138
    (SB0338)
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of MarylandDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0370Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0457
    (SB0385)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0548
    (SB0429)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0568Health Occupations - Health Care Practitioners - Exemption From Participation in Aid in DyingDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0632 / CH0622Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0655 / CH0272Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 272Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0727 / CH0496Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing RequirementsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB0730 / CH0075
    (SB0549 / CH0074)
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination DateDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1021 / CH0730Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1113 / CH0573
    (SB0663 / CH0572)
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)Delegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Economic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1226 / CH0224
    (SB0597 / CH0223)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1231
    (SB0675)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - American Legion Post 381 AnnexDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1278State Board of Physicians - Offices or Facilities for Performing Surgical ProceduresDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1319
    (SB0620 / CH0415)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1444 / CH0652Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore CityDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1458 / CH0414
    (SB0606 / CH0413)
Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans CommissionDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0163Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School ScheduleSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0338
    (HB0138)
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0385
    (HB0457)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0429
    (HB0548)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0540Morgan State University - Student HousingSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0549 / CH0074
    (HB0730 / CH0075)
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination DateSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0597 / CH0223
    (HB1226 / CH0224)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0606 / CH0413
    (HB1458 / CH0414)
Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans CommissionSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0620 / CH0415
    (HB1319)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0630 / CH0418Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival PermitSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0663 / CH0572
    (HB1113 / CH0573)
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)Senator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0675
    (HB1231)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - American Legion Post 381 AnnexSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1064Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.