Associations

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0390 / CH0586
    (SB0310 / CH0587)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructureSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0464 / CH0466Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition PermitDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0691Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017)Delegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0714
    (SB0656)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0775 / CH0221
    (SB0600 / CH0222)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1190Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - FeesDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1641Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative AdvocacyDelegate LamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0038 / CH0040Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and CouncilsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0325Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's LicensesSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0450 / CH0526
    (HB0880 / CH0525)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0571 / CH0017
    (HB0909)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection ActSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0600 / CH0222
    (HB0775 / CH0221)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0656
    (HB0714)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.