Attachments and Garnishments

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0629Courts - Garnishment of Joint Account - Burden of Proof (Bank Customer Protection Act)Delegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0814Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment FeesDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0071Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement PlansChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0553 / CH0499Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - ProhibitionSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 499Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.