Attachments and Garnishments

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0431 / CH0039
    (SB0355)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
HB0707 / CH0195
    (SB0372 / CH0194)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0078 / CH0044State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted PrizesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0355
    (HB0431 / CH0039)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0372 / CH0194
    (HB0707 / CH0195)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0397Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal PropertySenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.