Ballots

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0087
    (SB0156)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0143 / CH0107Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and ProceduresChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0168Election Law - Required Notifications - Voter Challenges or IntimidationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0517
    (SB0358)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0532
    (SB1133)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0539Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0724Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1056Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1382 / CH0439
    (SB1121 / CH0440)
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary ElectionDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Judicial ProceedingsElections (G1)
HB1626 / CH0825Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing RegistrationDelegate AliEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0064Voter Registration - Affiliating With a PartySenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0130 / CH0282Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign PrincipalsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0156
    (HB0087)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0358
    (HB0517)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0406Election Law - Voting System - Digital ScannersSenator PetersIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0711Election Law - Elections by MailSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0960Election Law - Reporting of Precinct ResultsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1133
    (HB0532)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentitySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.