Banks and Trust Companies

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0458Personal and Business Documents - EvidenceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0498Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory ReviewDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0576
    (SB0794)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0814Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment FeesDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0930Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1306Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task ForceDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HJ0003Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0794
    (HB0576)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.