Blind Persons

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0396 / CH0503
    (SB0446 / CH0502)
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher EducationDelegate TurnerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Appropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Higher Education (F2)
HB0486
    (SB0189)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0519
    (SB0528)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp MerrickCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1009
    (SB0789)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1242
    (SB0419 / CH0498)
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - FundingDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedWays and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1300Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility EvaluationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0020Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name ChangeSenator ForehandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0189
    (HB0486)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0419 / CH0498
    (HB1242)
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - FundingSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 498Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0446 / CH0502
    (HB0396 / CH0503)
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher EducationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0528
    (HB0519)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp MerrickSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0789
    (HB1009)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.