Blind Persons

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0216Prince George's County Board of Education - Student Hearing and Vision Screenings - Reporting Requirements PG 504-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0798 / CH0311Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)Delegate KittlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1075State Finance and Procurement - Preferences - NonprofitsDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1088 / CH0631State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1206Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - EstablishmentDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1552Procurement - Preferred Providers - Price Determinations, Work Opportunities, and SubcontractingDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0482Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - EstablishmentSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0570 / CH0312Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)Senator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:04 P.M.