Boats and Ships

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0299State Boat Act - Certificate of Number Fee - Altering Motor Horsepower for Fee ExemptionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0603
    (SB0490 / CH0174)
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage ProducersDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0649Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Maritime MuseumDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0835Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1368
    (SB1083)
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder ExemptionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0094Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0490 / CH0174
    (HB0603)
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage ProducersSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0565Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1083
    (HB1368)
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder ExemptionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.