Bonds

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0074 / CH0021
    (SB0782 / CH0087)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High StadiumDelegate GrammerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0080
    (SB0610)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bethesda Graceful Growing Together Community CenterDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0082 / CH0681
    (SB0125 / CH0682)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0451 / CH0186
    (SB0375 / CH0185)
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education RequirementsDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0466
    (SB0870)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0717 / CH0143Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0764 / CH0541
    (SB0676 / CH0540)
Requirements for Filial Support - RepealDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
HB0930
    (SB0640)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1055
    (SB0737 / CH0424)
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and RepaymentSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1173Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - RequirementsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB1181Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1390
    (SB0880)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - ReformDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1494
    (SB0459 / CH0807)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, C.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
RulesInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0125 / CH0682
    (HB0082 / CH0681)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0375 / CH0185
    (HB0451 / CH0186)
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education RequirementsSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0459 / CH0807
    (HB1494)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0520State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - RegistrationSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0530Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0610
    (HB0080)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bethesda Graceful Growing Together Community CenterSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0640
    (HB0930)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0676 / CH0540
    (HB0764 / CH0541)
Requirements for Filial Support - RepealSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0737 / CH0424
    (HB1055)
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and RepaymentSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0782 / CH0087
    (HB0074 / CH0021)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High StadiumSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0870
    (HB0466)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0880
    (HB1390)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - ReformSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0924 / CH0479Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and RegistrantsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.