Boundaries

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0071Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic AreaDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0233Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0236Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of MapDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0561 / CH0315
    (SB0748 / CH0314)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilityDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0639 / CH0627Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0670 / CH0132Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0730
    (SB0542 / CH0498)
Election Law - Polling Places - ElectioneeringDelegate ParrottVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0832
    (SB0361)
Congressional Districting ProcessDelegate NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0835
    (SB0948)
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0971
    (SB0107)
Anne Arundel County - School Board - MembershipDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1060Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering BoundariesWashington County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1269
    (SB0240)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0107
    (HB0971)
Anne Arundel County - School Board - MembershipSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0240
    (HB1269)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0361
    (HB0832)
Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0542 / CH0498
    (HB0730)
Election Law - Polling Places - ElectioneeringSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 498Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0748 / CH0314
    (HB0561 / CH0315)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilitySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0940Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary MonumentsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Generally (L1)
SB0948
    (HB0835)
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB1071Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness InitiativePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.