Bridges and Tunnels

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0797 / CH0140Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water AccessDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1046Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1244
    (SB0795)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1325Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisDelegate WoodIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1528Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill NetsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0093Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third SpanSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
1/23/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0132Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue AccountSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0299Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western MD Railroad Lift BridgeSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0795
    (HB1244)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0906Transportation - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SJ0005Public-Private PartnershipsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.