Budget and Management, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0221
    (SB0073)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0564 / CH0435State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0698Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0702
    (SB0657)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0776
    (SB0687)
State Personnel - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0965 / CH0291
    (SB0334)
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015Delegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1022
    (SB0609)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - EstablishmentDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1193
    (SB0228)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0073
    (HB0221)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0228
    (HB1193)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0334
    (HB0965 / CH0291)
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015Senator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0657
    (HB0702)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0687
    (HB0776)
State Personnel - Parental LeaveSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0793 / CH0199State Personnel - Automatic Step Increases - Standard Pay PlanSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0854State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0893Commission on Free Trade, Currency Manipulation, and State Sovereignty - EstablishmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.