Budgets

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Frederick County Public Charter School Program - EstablishmentDelegate SchulzIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0070 / CH0310
    (SB0055)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)SpeakerEnacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 310AppropriationsBudget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0071 / CH0495
    (SB0056)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)AppropriationsBudget and TaxationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0104Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0215
    (SB0183 / CH0477)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0367 / CH0416
    (SB0469)
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response SystemDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB0546Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0690Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities)Delegate KrimmIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0784Harford Community College - Requirements to Propose Tuition IncreaseDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansCommunity Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB0787Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0809
    (SB0540 / CH0181)
Municipalities - Parking AuthoritiesDelegate McMillanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsMunicipal Corporations (L3)
HB0920State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of CostsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0986State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in GovernmentDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1022
    (SB0609)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - EstablishmentDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1079
    (SB0627)
Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - AlterationsDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1211State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in AppropriationsDelegate KormanIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0055
    (HB0070 / CH0310)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0056
    (HB0071 / CH0495)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0183 / CH0477
    (HB0215)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0252Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0360 / CH0162Calvert County - Budget Hearings and ProceduresCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0440Education - Expenditures of Revenues - Reporting by County Boards of EducationSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0469
    (HB0367 / CH0416)
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response SystemSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0540 / CH0181
    (HB0809)
Municipalities - Parking AuthoritiesSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0627
    (HB1079)
Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - Alteration and StudySenator EckardtIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0660State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0863 / CH0124Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - RevisionsSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.