Business and Economic Development, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0203Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore CityDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0386 / CH0109
    (SB0203)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business RefundDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0564
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Economic Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0681Invest Maryland Program - Alteration of Program RequirementsDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0698 / CH0241
    (SB0356 / CH0240)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudyDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0751Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0803 / CH0390Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax CreditChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0948
    (SB0708)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1017 / CH0659Income Tax Credit - Wineries and VineyardsDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 659Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1055 / CH0661
    (SB1063)
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service CommissionDelegate BraveboyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 661Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1206Strategic Industry Partnership - Income Tax CreditDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1231State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1315 / CH0150Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking (Maryland Jobs Development Act)Delegate ClagettApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1326Task Force to Improve the Business Climate in MarylandDelegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1347
    (SB0138)
Build Maryland Tax Credit ActDelegate McHaleIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0070 / CH0175Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland ProgramChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0138
    (HB1347)
Build Maryland Tax Credit ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0183 / CH0028Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax CreditChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0203
    (HB0386 / CH0109)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business RefundSenator KingIn the House - Rereferred to Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0356 / CH0240
    (HB0698 / CH0241)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudySenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Finance
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0482 / CH0482Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer CostsSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2013 - 11:30 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0498
    (HB0564)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0615Economic Development - Job Creation Incentive Tax CreditSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0619Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013Senator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0708
    (HB0948)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1022Prince George's County - Green Business ZonesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.