Business and Economic Development, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0401Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Minority Business Reporting RequirementDelegate Howard, C.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0421
    (SB0312)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0550State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0603Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task ForceDelegate Robinson, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0753
    (SB0905 / CH0486)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax CreditDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0789
    (SB0584)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0810
    (SB0365)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit - Business IncubatorsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0916Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1084
    (SB0581)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1089
    (SB0196)
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1213
    (SB0662 / CH0191)
State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon CommissionDelegate MieleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0196
    (HB1089)
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0312
    (HB0421)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0365
    (HB0810)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit - Business IncubatorsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0370 / CH0164Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0405Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0488Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0507Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0581
    (HB1084)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0584
    (HB0789)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0624Task Force to Study the Expansion of Career and Technical Education in MarylandSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0662 / CH0191
    (HB1213)
State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon CommissionSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0774
    (HB0940 / CH0138)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0775
    (HB0939 / CH0137)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0776
    (HB0943 / CH0141)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0896 / CH0390Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program and FundSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0905 / CH0486
    (HB0753)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax CreditSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.