Business Trusts

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0070Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – EstablishmentSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0890Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick LeaveSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0999 / CH0594Recordation Tax - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 3:56 P.M.