Campaign Financing

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0053Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - ProhibitedDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0174
    (SB0375)
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - ExpansionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0227State Legislature Local Public Campaign Financing ActDelegate KormanIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0260Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Contributions and Expenditures - Preelection PeriodDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0332Election Law - Use of Campaign Material Purchased Under the Authority of a Prior TreasurerDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0383Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0737Election Law - Campaign Finance Reports - Bank StatementsDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0755Campaign Finance – Contributions in Name of Another – Fair Campaign Financing FundDelegate MosbyIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0759Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Limit on Cash ContributionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0763Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration StatusDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0785Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0981
    (SB0875)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1287Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - ProhibitionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1576Elections - Heads of State Governmental Units - Prohibition on Candidacy for Public OfficeDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1648
    (SB1035)
Declaration of Rights – Access to InformationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB1703Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HB1805Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on FirearmsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HJ0011
    (SJ0007)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate GainesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0244Campaign Material – Social Media – Consent for Use of ImageSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0246State Personnel - Maryland Hatch ActSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0374Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0375
    (HB0174)
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - ExpansionSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0426Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance EntitySenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0592Joint Committee on Election Oversight - EstablishmentSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0875
    (HB0981)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1035
    (HB1648)
Declaration of Rights - Right to InformationSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0007
    (HJ0011)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

April 16, 2018 4:12 P.M.