Camps

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0658
    (SB0344 / CH0342)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB1126
    (SB0827)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Restoration ProjectDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0344 / CH0342
    (HB0658)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0827
    (HB1126)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Restoration ProjectSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0857Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Septic SystemSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.