Camps

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0321 / CH0334
    (SB0046 / CH0333)
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0516 / CH0269Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0046 / CH0333
    (HB0321 / CH0334)
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.